Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3589 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/15/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/08/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call