Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar