Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:47PM
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee