Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1144 | Journal Page: 2498 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2498 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2498 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1104 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1104 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended | 2-Hunter | Journal Page: 2443 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended 2-Hunter | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended 1-Hunter | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Filed |