House | 05/07/2025 | Postponed | 5/9/25 10:00 AM | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Postponed | 5/7/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2805 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2805 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Postponed 5/7/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Filed |