Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3750 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2025
Bill March 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 4, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 21, 2025
Witness List April 21, 2025
Bill April 21, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 5, 2025