House | 05/01/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1378 | Journal Page: 2576 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1826 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 780 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 780 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Filed |