Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#767 | Journal Page: 2096 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2096 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#767 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#688 | Journal Page: 2002 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2002 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#688 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2005 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1539 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |