Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3775 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee