Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB378 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R2444 LHC/MM-D
 By: Morales of Harris H.B. No. 378




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an increase in the amount of the exemption of residence
 homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district and the
 protection of school districts against the resulting loss in local
 revenue.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.13(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  An adult is entitled to exemption from taxation by a
 school district of $200,000 [$100,000] of the appraised value of
 the adult's residence homestead, except that only $5,000 of the
 exemption applies to an entity operating under former Chapter 17,
 18, 25, 26, 27, or 28, Education Code, as those chapters existed on
 May 1, 1995, as permitted by Section 11.301, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 46.071, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-3) and amending Subsections (b-2) and (c-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a-3)  Beginning with the 2026-2027 school year, in addition
 to state aid a school district is entitled to under Subsection
 (a-2), a school district is also entitled to additional state aid
 under this subchapter to the extent that state and local revenue
 used to service debt eligible under this chapter is less than the
 state and local revenue that would have been available to the
 district under this chapter as it existed on September 1, 2025, if
 any increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section
 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, as proposed by the 89th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2025, had not occurred.
 (b-2)  Subject to Subsections (c-2), (d), and (e),
 additional state aid under this section beginning with the
 2023-2024 school year is equal to the amount by which the loss of
 local interest and sinking revenue for debt service attributable to
 any increase in a residence homestead exemption under Section
 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, and any additional
 limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d) of that article as
 proposed by the 88th Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, and any
 increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c),
 Article VIII, Texas Constitution, as proposed by the 89th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2025, is not offset by a gain in state
 aid under this chapter.
 (c-2)  For the purpose of determining state aid under
 Subsection [Subsections] (a-2) or (a-3) [and (b-2)], local interest
 and sinking revenue for debt service is limited to revenue required
 to service debt eligible under this chapter as of September 1, 2023,
 or as of September 1, 2025, respectively, or authorized by the
 voters but not yet issued as of September 1, 2023, or as of
 September 1, 2025, respectively, that later becomes eligible under
 this chapter, including refunding of the applicable [that] debt,
 subject to Section 46.061.  The limitation imposed by Section
 46.034(a) does not apply for the purpose of determining state aid
 under Subsection (a-2) or (a-3) [this section].
 SECTION 3.  Section 48.2543, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) and amending Subsection (b) to read as
 follows:
 (a-2)  Beginning with the 2026-2027 school year, in addition
 to state aid a school district is entitled to under Subsection
 (a-1), a school district is entitled to additional state aid to the
 extent that state and local revenue under this chapter and Chapter
 49 is less than the state and local revenue that would have been
 available to the district under this chapter and Chapter 49 as those
 chapters existed on September 1, 2025, if any increase in the
 residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, as proposed by the 89th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2025, had not occurred.
 (b)  The lesser of the school district's currently adopted
 maintenance and operations tax rate or the adopted maintenance and
 operations tax rate for:
 (1)  the 2021 tax year is used for the purpose of
 determining additional state aid under Subsection (a); [and]
 (2)  the 2022 tax year is used for the purpose of
 determining additional state aid under Subsection (a-1); and
 (3)  the 2025 tax year is used for the purpose of
 determining additional state aid under Subsection (a-2).
 SECTION 4.  Section 11.13, Tax Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies only to an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after
 January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2026, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, to increase the amount of the exemption of
 residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district
 is approved by the voters.  If that amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.