House | 05/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1903 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |