House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed | 5/8/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2243 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |