House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 797 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 797 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |