House | 05/01/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 797 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 797 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |