Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 20, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Witness List April 2, 2025
Analysis April 2, 2025
Bill April 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 29, 2025
Fiscal Note April 29, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 18, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis April 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 2, 2025