LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB3892
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3892
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3892
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/24/2025
8:00 am
Land & Resource Management Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
SB840
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2512
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB3139
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3798
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3892
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 1 2025 5:00PM
HB4373
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4398
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4582
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB4689
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5187
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5658
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB5666
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
04/24/2025
8:00 am
Land & Resource Management Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
SB840
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2512
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB3139
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3798
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3892
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 1 2025 5:00PM
HB4373
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4398
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4582
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB4689
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5187
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5658
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB5666
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar