Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4013 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R16229 MLH-D
 By: Plesa H.B. No. 4013




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the board of directors of certain
 appraisal districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6.0301, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsections (c), (d), and (g) and adding Subsections (b-1), (c-1),
 (c-2), and (c-3) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The board of directors of the appraisal district shall
 divide the district into four numbered, single-member districts for
 electing directors.
 (c)  The appraisal district is governed by a board of nine
 directors.  Four [Five] directors are appointed by the taxing units
 that participate in the district in the manner prescribed by
 Section 6.03.  One director is elected from each single-member
 district. To be elected to a position on the board of directors of
 the district, a candidate must receive more votes than any other
 candidate for that position.  The district shall hold an election to
 elect the appropriate number of directors on the uniform election
 date prescribed by Section 41.001, Election Code, in November of
 each even-numbered year. [Three directors are elected by majority
 vote at the general election for state and county officers by the
 voters of the county in which the district is established.] The
 county assessor-collector serves as an ex officio director.
 (c-1)  The board of directors may revise the single-member
 districts as necessary or appropriate.
 (c-2)  The board of directors shall revise each
 single-member district after each federal decennial census to
 reflect population changes.
 (c-3)  When the boundaries of the single-member districts
 are changed, a director in office on the effective date of the
 change, or elected or appointed before the effective date of the
 change to a term of office beginning on or after the effective date
 of the change, is entitled to serve the term or the remainder of the
 term in the single-member district to which elected or appointed
 even though the change in boundaries places the director's
 residence outside the single-member district from which the
 director was elected or appointed.
 (d)  To be eligible to serve in an appointive position on the
 board of directors, an individual [other than the county
 assessor-collector] must be a resident of the district and must
 have resided in the district for at least two years immediately
 preceding the date the individual takes office.  To be eligible to
 serve in an elective position on the board of directors, an
 individual must be a resident of the single-member district from
 which the individual is elected and have resided in the
 single-member district for at least two years immediately preceding
 the date the individual takes office. An individual who is
 otherwise eligible to serve on the board is not ineligible because
 of membership on the governing body of a taxing unit.  An employee
 of a taxing unit that participates in the district is not eligible
 to serve on the board unless the individual is also a member of the
 governing body or an elected official of a taxing unit that
 participates in the district.
 (g)  If a vacancy occurs in an elective position on the board
 of directors, the board of directors shall appoint by majority vote
 of its members a person to fill the vacancy.  A person appointed to
 fill a vacancy in an elective position must have the qualifications
 required of a director elected at a general election for the
 position on the board to which the person is appointed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 6.032, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A person shall indicate on the application for a place
 on the ballot the single-member district that the person seeks to
 represent.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 1, 2026, the board of
 directors of each appraisal district established in a county with a
 population of 75,000 or more shall divide the district into
 single-member districts as required by Section 6.0301(b-1), Tax
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 5.13(b), (c), and (d), Chapter 1 (S.B.
 2), Acts of the 88th Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  (a) The changes in law made by this Act apply
 only to an election of members of the board of directors of an
 appraisal district that is held on or after January 1, 2026.
 (b)  At the first meeting of the board of directors of an
 appraisal district described by Section 6.0301, Tax Code, as
 amended by this Act, that is held on or after January 1, 2027, the
 four directors elected on the uniform election date prescribed by
 Section 41.001, Election Code, in November 2026 shall draw lots to
 determine which two directors shall serve a term of two years and
 which two directors shall serve a term of four years. Thereafter,
 all elected directors serve four-year terms.
 (c)  The term of an appointed appraisal district director
 serving on December 31, 2026, on the board of directors of an
 appraisal district described by Section 6.0301, Tax Code, as
 amended by this Act, expires on January 1, 2027.  Not later than
 December 31, 2026, the taxing units participating in the appraisal
 district that are entitled to appoint directors shall appoint four
 directors to serve terms that begin on January 1, 2027.  Two
 directors shall be appointed to serve a term of one year, and the
 other two directors shall be appointed to serve a term of three
 years.  Thereafter, all appointed directors serve four-year terms.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.