Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1664 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1009 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1009 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2197 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#862 | Journal Page: 2197 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2193 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#862 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2198 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/07/2025 | Filed |