Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 9:12PM
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee