Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 9:12PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)