House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 842 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 842 | |
House | 03/10/2025 | Filed |