Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4203 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/16/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 7:22PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:47PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
04/16/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 7:22PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:47PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar