House
|
05/07/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|