Senate | 04/10/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1038 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1348 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1075 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Record vote | RV#94 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Record vote | RV#84 | Journal Page: 1053 |
House | 04/08/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1053 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1053 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |