2 | 4 | | |
---|
3 | 5 | | |
---|
4 | 6 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 7 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 8 | | relating to providing for a reduction in the total number of state |
---|
7 | 9 | | agency rules. |
---|
8 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 2001, Government Code, is |
---|
10 | 12 | | amended by adding Section 2001.008 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 13 | | Sec. 2001.008. REQUIREMENT TO REDUCE NUMBER OF RULES. (a) |
---|
12 | 14 | | Not later than January 1, 2026, each state agency shall determine |
---|
13 | 15 | | the total number of rules adopted by the agency under this chapter |
---|
14 | 16 | | or other law that are in effect on that date and post that number in |
---|
15 | 17 | | a conspicuous location on the agency's Internet website, along with |
---|
16 | 18 | | an explanation that the number represents the current total number |
---|
17 | 19 | | of rules of that agency. |
---|
18 | 20 | | (b) Not later than April 1, 2026, each state agency shall |
---|
19 | 21 | | identify a number of rules equal to 10 percent of the number of |
---|
20 | 22 | | rules posted by the agency under Subsection (a) that the agency will |
---|
21 | 23 | | repeal. |
---|
22 | 24 | | (c) Not later than July 1, 2026, each state agency shall |
---|
23 | 25 | | repeal the rules identified by the agency under Subsection (b). |
---|
24 | 26 | | (d) This section expires December 31, 2026. |
---|
25 | 27 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|