Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4247 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/14/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule