House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2041 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1151 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 867 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 867 | |
House | 03/10/2025 | Filed |