LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB4268
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB4268
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4268
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/17/2025
10:30 am
Insurance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.028
HB1464
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1635
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2516
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3317
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3502
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4012
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4268
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4386
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4877
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB916
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/17/2025
10:30 am
Insurance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.028
HB1464
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1635
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2516
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3317
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3502
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4012
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4268
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4386
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4877
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB916
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars