LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB4275
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB4275
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4275
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025
10:30 am
Elections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB569
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB766
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
HB1638
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2316
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
HB2773
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2785
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
HB3113
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
HB3709
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3775
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4275
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee