House | 05/05/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 869 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 869 | |
House | 03/10/2025 | Filed |