Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4371 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/29/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 4:18PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
04/29/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 4:18PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar