House | 05/07/2025 | Postponed | 5/10/25 10:00 AM | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3264 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1698 | Journal Page: 3216 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2469 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 876 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 876 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |