Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4419 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/08/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed