House | 05/01/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2607 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2077 | Journal Page: 2606 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1740 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |