Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1060 | Journal Page: 2371 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2371 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2371 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2250 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#925 | Journal Page: 2244 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2241 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#925 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2249 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1837 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 918 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 918 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |