Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB446 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 89R2370 KKR-F
22 By: Flores H.B. No. 446
33
44
55
66
77 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
88 AN ACT
99 relating to workplace heat illness prevention, including the
1010 creation of a heat illness prevention advisory board; imposing
1111 administrative penalties; providing a private cause of action.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 2, Labor Code, is amended by
1414 adding Chapter 53 to read as follows:
1515 CHAPTER 53. WORKPLACE HEAT SAFETY
1616 Sec. 53.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1717 (1) "Advisory board" means the heat illness prevention
1818 advisory board established under Section 53.003.
1919 (2) "Commission" means the Texas Workforce
2020 Commission.
2121 (3) "Employer" means a person who employs one or more
2222 employees.
2323 (4) "Heat illness" means a serious medical condition
2424 resulting from the body's inability to cope with a particular heat
2525 load and includes heat cramps, heat exhaustion, heat syncope, and
2626 heatstroke.
2727 (5) "Heat safety expert" means an individual who:
2828 (A) holds a certification or educational degree
2929 in environmental science, human physiology, medicine, occupational
3030 safety, public health, or a related field; and
3131 (B) performs work focused on heat safety in the
3232 workplace.
3333 Sec. 53.002. APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies to all
3434 employers in this state, regardless of the location of employment,
3535 type of employment, or size or type of employer.
3636 Sec. 53.003. HEAT ILLNESS PREVENTION ADVISORY BOARD. (a) A
3737 heat illness prevention advisory board is established to assist the
3838 commission in adopting heat illness prevention standards under this
3939 chapter.
4040 (b) The advisory board consists of the following members
4141 appointed by the commission:
4242 (1) two members who are heat safety experts;
4343 (2) two members who are employed as construction
4444 workers;
4545 (3) one member who is an employer;
4646 (4) one member who is a representative of a nonprofit
4747 organization engaged in worker safety issues; and
4848 (5) one member who is a representative of construction
4949 worker labor unions.
5050 (c) The advisory board shall develop and recommend to the
5151 commission heat illness prevention standards, consistent with this
5252 chapter, that are designed to protect employees from heat illness
5353 in indoor and outdoor worksites.
5454 Sec. 53.004. HEAT ILLNESS PREVENTION STANDARDS. (a) The
5555 commission by rule shall adopt heat illness prevention standards.
5656 In adopting the standards, the commission shall give full
5757 consideration to the recommendations the advisory board makes under
5858 Section 53.003(c).
5959 (b) The heat illness prevention standards must:
6060 (1) be consistent with the standards and
6161 recommendations relating to heat and workforce safety contained in
6262 the Criteria for a Recommended Standard: Occupational Exposure to
6363 Heat and Hot Environments published by the National Institute for
6464 Occupational Safety and Health, as those standards and
6565 recommendations existed on January 1, 2025; and
6666 (2) include:
6767 (A) requirements for providing:
6868 (i) drinking water;
6969 (ii) access to nearby shade or
7070 climate-controlled environments, restrooms, and handwashing
7171 stations; and
7272 (iii) rest periods;
7373 (B) standards for effective emergency response
7474 procedures;
7575 (C) standards for heat acclimatization;
7676 (D) training on heat and workforce safety for
7777 employees and supervisors; and
7878 (E) other related standards for protecting
7979 workers from heat illness.
8080 Sec. 53.005. NOTICE TO EMPLOYEES. (a) Each employer shall
8181 post in a conspicuous place accessible to employees the notice the
8282 commission prescribes under Subsection (b) at:
8383 (1) the employer's place of business; and
8484 (2) if applicable, each worksite at which employees
8585 perform job duties for the employer.
8686 (b) The commission shall prescribe the form and content of
8787 the employer notice required by Subsection (a) and make the notice
8888 available on the commission's Internet website. The notice must:
8989 (1) be in English, Spanish, Vietnamese, and any other
9090 language the commission determines appropriate; and
9191 (2) outline:
9292 (A) the heat illness prevention standards the
9393 commission adopts under this chapter; and
9494 (B) employees' rights under this chapter.
9595 Sec. 53.006. EMPLOYEE TRAINING REQUIRED. Each employer
9696 shall provide training to the employer's employees about the
9797 commission's heat illness prevention standards as the standards
9898 relate to employees, supervisors, and employers. The training,
9999 including any related written materials, must be provided to each
100100 employee in a language that the employee understands.
101101 Sec. 53.007. UNLAWFUL EMPLOYMENT PRACTICE. An employer
102102 commits an unlawful employment practice under this chapter if the
103103 employer retaliates or discriminates against an employee who:
104104 (1) experiences heat illness in the workplace;
105105 (2) reports to the employer an instance of heat
106106 illness or a violation of this chapter or other applicable
107107 standards;
108108 (3) files a complaint with the commission related to a
109109 violation of this chapter or rules adopted under this chapter;
110110 (4) files an action related to a violation of this
111111 chapter or rules adopted under this chapter; or
112112 (5) testifies, assists, or participates in any manner
113113 in an investigation, proceeding, or hearing under this chapter.
114114 Sec. 53.008. ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY. The commission shall
115115 assess an administrative penalty in an amount that is not less than
116116 $1,000 against an employer for each violation of this chapter or a
117117 rule adopted under this chapter. Each day a violation continues or
118118 occurs is a separate violation for purposes of imposing a penalty.
119119 Sec. 53.009. CIVIL LIABILITY. (a) In addition to any
120120 administrative penalty assessed under this chapter, an employer is
121121 liable in a civil action for personal injury, death, or other
122122 damages caused by the employer's failure to comply with the heat
123123 illness prevention standards the commission adopts. An employee is
124124 not required to exhaust any applicable administrative remedies
125125 before filing an action under this section.
126126 (b) An employee who prevails in an action against an
127127 employer under this section is entitled to recover from the
128128 employer court costs and reasonable attorney's fees.
129129 (c) A court that finds that an employer knowingly violated
130130 the heat illness prevention standards adopted under this chapter
131131 shall award exemplary damages in an amount equal to three times the
132132 amount of compensatory damages awarded to the employee.
133133 SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
134134 date of this Act, but not later than October 1, 2025, the Texas
135135 Workforce Commission shall appoint the advisory board members to
136136 the heat illness prevention advisory board established under
137137 Section 53.003, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
138138 (b) Not later than January 1, 2026, the heat illness
139139 prevention advisory board shall submit to the Texas Workforce
140140 Commission the recommended workplace heat illness prevention
141141 standards the board develops under Section 53.003(c), Labor Code,
142142 as added by this Act.
143143 (c) Not later than March 1, 2026, the Texas Workforce
144144 Commission shall:
145145 (1) adopt heat illness prevention standards as
146146 required by Section 53.004, Labor Code, as added by this Act; and
147147 (2) prescribe the employer notice required by Section
148148 53.005, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
149149 SECTION 3. An employer is not required to comply with
150150 Chapter 53, Labor Code, as added by this Act, before March 1, 2026.
151151 SECTION 4. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
152152 only to an unlawful employment practice that occurs on or after
153153 March 1, 2026.
154154 (b) The change in law made by this Act applies only to a
155155 cause of action that accrues on or after March 1, 2026.
156156 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
157157 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
158158 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
159159 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
160160 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.