House | 04/30/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker | Journal Page: 919 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 919 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |