House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2437 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1141 | Journal Page: 2496 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2496 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2496 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1100 | Journal Page: 2436 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2436 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2436 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1826 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 921 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 921 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Filed |