Senate | 05/13/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2474 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1117 | Journal Page: 2474 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2474 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-Vasut | Journal Page: 2474 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 1, Section 4 | Journal Page: 2473 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2473 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2450 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1107 | Journal Page: 2449 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2449 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1107 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1106 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | 2-Moody | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Moody | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended | 1-Hull | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended 1-Hull | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 2446 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Postponed | 4/30/25 4:30 PM | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Filed |