1 | 1 | | 89R13555 MPF-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Bhojani H.B. No. 4528 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the use of preferential voting in certain elections. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as the Texas Preferential |
---|
12 | 12 | | Voting Act. |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 2. The purpose of this Act is to improve the |
---|
14 | 14 | | democratic process by implementing a preferential voting system in |
---|
15 | 15 | | certain Texas elections to: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) ensure that candidates elected to office receive |
---|
17 | 17 | | majority support; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) enhance voter participation by eliminating the |
---|
19 | 19 | | need for runoff elections. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 3. Chapter 2, Election Code, is amended by adding |
---|
21 | 21 | | Subchapter E to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | SUBCHAPTER E. PREFERENTIAL VOTING |
---|
23 | 23 | | Sec. 2.101. PREFERENTIAL VOTING IN CERTAIN PRIMARY |
---|
24 | 24 | | ELECTIONS. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a primary |
---|
25 | 25 | | election to nominate a candidate for statewide office in the |
---|
26 | 26 | | executive branch or a legislative office of the state or federal |
---|
27 | 27 | | government must use a preferential voting system as provided by |
---|
28 | 28 | | this subchapter. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b) Unless required by federal law, a primary election to |
---|
30 | 30 | | nominate the candidates for the office of president or |
---|
31 | 31 | | vice-president of the United States may not use a preferential |
---|
32 | 32 | | voting system. |
---|
33 | 33 | | Sec. 2.102. PREFERENTIAL VOTING IN MUNICIPALITY ELECTIONS. |
---|
34 | 34 | | The governing body of a municipality may authorize the use of a |
---|
35 | 35 | | preferential voting system as provided by this subchapter for the |
---|
36 | 36 | | election of an officer of the municipality by majority vote. |
---|
37 | 37 | | Sec. 2.103. ADOPTION OF PREFERENTIAL VOTING PROCEDURES. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (a) The secretary of state shall prescribe procedures to allow for |
---|
39 | 39 | | an election of an office requiring a majority vote using a |
---|
40 | 40 | | preferential voting system. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) The system must allow a voter to rank each candidate for |
---|
42 | 42 | | an office through a numerical designation from the candidate the |
---|
43 | 43 | | voter favors most to the candidate the voter favors least. |
---|
44 | 44 | | Sec. 2.104. DETERMINATION OF ELECTION RESULT. (a) If no |
---|
45 | 45 | | candidate receives a majority of the votes cast designating the |
---|
46 | 46 | | highest favorable ranking for an office, the votes of the candidate |
---|
47 | 47 | | receiving the fewest number of votes are reassigned to the |
---|
48 | 48 | | candidate ranking next highest in the preference of a voter. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (b) If after reassigning votes under Subsection (a) no |
---|
50 | 50 | | candidate receives a majority of the votes cast designating the |
---|
51 | 51 | | modified highest favorable ranking, the reassignment of a vote to a |
---|
52 | 52 | | voter's next most preferred candidate under Subsection (a) |
---|
53 | 53 | | continues until one candidate receives a majority. |
---|
54 | 54 | | (c) If two or more candidates tie for the least number of |
---|
55 | 55 | | votes before a reassignment of votes under Subsection (a) or (b), |
---|
56 | 56 | | the tied candidates shall cast lots to determine which candidate's |
---|
57 | 57 | | votes are reassigned. |
---|
58 | 58 | | Sec. 2.105. RUNOFF ELECTION NOT HELD. Notwithstanding any |
---|
59 | 59 | | other law, a runoff election is not held for an office to which this |
---|
60 | 60 | | subchapter applies. |
---|
61 | 61 | | Sec. 2.106. ACTION BY SECRETARY OF STATE. (a) The |
---|
62 | 62 | | secretary of state shall conduct a statewide effort to educate |
---|
63 | 63 | | voters regarding the procedures for voting with a preferential |
---|
64 | 64 | | voting system. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (b) The secretary of state shall develop materials for the |
---|
66 | 66 | | training of election officials conducting an election using a |
---|
67 | 67 | | preferential voting system. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (c) The training materials developed under Subsection (b) |
---|
69 | 69 | | must be made available on the secretary of state's Internet |
---|
70 | 70 | | website. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (d) The secretary of state may use any available funds to |
---|
72 | 72 | | assist an authority of a political subdivision conducting an |
---|
73 | 73 | | election using a preferential voting system as provided by this |
---|
74 | 74 | | subchapter, including the purchase of voting machines, if the funds |
---|
75 | 75 | | have been appropriated for that purpose. |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 4. (a) The secretary of state and the governing |
---|
77 | 77 | | body of a municipality that authorizes the use of a preferential |
---|
78 | 78 | | voting system under Section 2.102, Election Code, as added by this |
---|
79 | 79 | | Act, shall conduct a study on the effectiveness of the use of a |
---|
80 | 80 | | preferential voting system under Subchapter E, Chapter 2, Election |
---|
81 | 81 | | Code, as added by this Act, including: |
---|
82 | 82 | | (1) any cost savings achieved through the use of a |
---|
83 | 83 | | preferential voting system; and |
---|
84 | 84 | | (2) whether voters prefer conducting elections using a |
---|
85 | 85 | | preferential voting system. |
---|
86 | 86 | | (b) Not later than December 31, 2029, the secretary of state |
---|
87 | 87 | | and the governing body of a municipality shall prepare and submit a |
---|
88 | 88 | | report to the legislature containing the findings of the study and |
---|
89 | 89 | | any recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
90 | 90 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2030. |
---|
91 | 91 | | SECTION 5. If any provision of this Act is declared invalid, |
---|
92 | 92 | | that declaration does not affect the validity of the remaining |
---|
93 | 93 | | portions of this Act. |
---|
94 | 94 | | SECTION 6. Not later than December 31, 2026, the secretary |
---|
95 | 95 | | of state shall prescribe the procedures required under Section |
---|
96 | 96 | | 2.103, Election Code, as added by this Act, and make available the |
---|
97 | 97 | | materials developed under Section 2.106, Election Code, as added by |
---|
98 | 98 | | this Act. |
---|
99 | 99 | | SECTION 7. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this |
---|
100 | 100 | | section, this Act takes effect January 1, 2027. |
---|
101 | 101 | | (b) Section 6 of this Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|