Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB46 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 3:40PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 7 2025 2:21PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/14/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 7 2025 2:21PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/03/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted