LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB4631
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB4631
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4631
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025
8:00 am
S/C on Juvenile Justice Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.014
HB1821
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB1822
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB1943
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB3882
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB4263
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4476
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4628
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB4631
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
HB4885
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4923
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB5461
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
HB5483
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5525
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/14/2025
8:00 am
S/C on Juvenile Justice Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.014
HB1821
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB1822
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB1943
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB3882
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB4263
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4476
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB4628
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB4631
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
HB4885
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4923
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB5461
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
HB5483
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5525
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted