House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Filed |