Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 4:26PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 4:59PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 4:59PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 4:59PM
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 4:59PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars