House | 05/05/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 943 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 943 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |