Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H No action taken in committee
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)