Senate | 05/07/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1613 | Journal Page: 3125 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3032 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1540 | Journal Page: 2991 |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3031 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3031 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2469 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1134 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 954 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 954 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |