Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB49 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/24/2025 11:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .