Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4945 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/30/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R21893 RDR-D
 By: Ashby, Bumgarner H.B. No. 4945




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas on the
 feasibility of offering alternative service retirement benefits to
 certain members of the retirement system engaged in wildland
 firefighting or employed in positions related to wildland
 firefighting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 825, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 825.1086 to read as follows:
 Sec. 825.1086.  STUDY AND REPORT ON ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
 RETIREMENT BENEFITS FOR CERTAIN WILDLAND FIREFIGHTERS AND RELATED
 EMPLOYEES.  (a)  The retirement system shall conduct a study on the
 feasibility of offering members who are Texas A&M Forest Service
 wildland firefighters and are employed in positions related to
 wildland firefighting alternative service retirement benefits
 under the system.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the retirement system shall
 assess the costs to and impact on the retirement system associated
 with offering members described by Subsection (a) the following
 alternative service retirement benefits:
 (1)  a service retirement benefit under the existing
 benefit plan that provides retirement eligibility and a
 supplemental benefit under Subsection (c) within a new tier, to be
 named Hazardous Duty, for:
 (A)  a member who is at least 55 years old and who
 has at least 10 years of service credit as a wildland firefighter;
 (B)  a member who has at least 25 years of service
 credit as a wildland firefighter, regardless of age; or
 (C)  a member who has at least 20 years of service
 credit as a wildland firefighter, except that the member's service
 retirement annuity will be actuarially reduced by five percent for
 every year of difference between the member's age at retirement and
 the normal retirement age within this tier; and
 (2)  a service retirement benefit under the existing
 plan that provides retirement eligibility and a supplemental
 benefit under Subsection (c), as applicable, within a new tier, to
 be named Hazardous Duty-Administrative Support, for:
 (A)  a member who is vested in the retirement
 system and who has been employed as a wildland firefighter during
 the entirety of the member's employment with the Texas A&M Forest
 Service; or
 (B)  a member who has service credit as a wildland
 firefighter equal to at least the minimum number of years of service
 credit required to vest in the system and who is employed in a
 position that provides support services to wildland firefighters on
 the member's retirement date.
 (c)  The standard service retirement annuity for a member who
 is eligible to retire under a proposal described by Subsection
 (b)(1) or (b)(2)(A) would be an amount computed on the basis of the
 member's average annual compensation for the five years of service,
 whether or not consecutive, in which the member received the
 highest annual compensation, times the sum of the percentage factor
 used in the computation of a standard service retirement annuity
 under Section 824.203(a) plus 0.5 percent.
 (d)  The standard service retirement annuity for a member who
 is eligible to retire under a proposal described by Subsection
 (b)(2)(B) based on the age and service requirements described in
 Subsection (b)(1) is the standard service retirement annuity
 described by Subsection (c), provided the member is not entitled to
 the additional 0.5 percent described by Subsection (c).
 (e)  Not later than March 1, 2026, the retirement system
 shall begin coordinating with the Texas A&M Forest Service to
 determine:
 (1)  positions that will qualify for benefits proposed
 by Subsection (b) and the salaries of both existing and terminated
 employees who accrued service credit for service provided on or
 after September 1, 2009, and who would be eligible to retire under
 any of the requirements proposed by Subsection (b) based on that
 service credit;
 (2)  the effectiveness of using either the standard
 service retirement annuity calculation under Section 824.203 plus
 0.5 percent or a different annuity calculation that would provide
 similar or more benefits than the calculation under Section 824.203
 for a member who would be eligible to retire under any of the
 requirements proposed by Subsection (b)(1) while maintaining the
 actuarial soundness of the retirement system;
 (3)  the additional percentage of salary contribution
 needed by both the employer and employee to provide for the
 alternative retirement benefits proposed by Subsection (b) while
 maintaining the actuarial soundness of the retirement system;
 (4)  the cost computed as additional employer and
 employee contributions to provide the alternative retirement
 benefits proposed by Subsection (b) attributable to service credit
 described by that subsection for service performed on or after
 September 1, 2009; and
 (5)  the cost and implications of the minimum age or
 service credit requirements proposed by Subsection (b) to the
 extent those age or service credit requirements are less stringent
 than the minimum age or service credit requirements provided by
 this subtitle.
 (f)  Not later than December 31, 2026, the retirement system
 shall prepare and submit a report to the legislature that contains
 the findings of the study and the determinations required by
 Subsection (e).
 (g)  The Legislative Budget Board and the State Pension
 Review Board shall, as necessary:
 (1)  assist the retirement system in conducting the
 study; and
 (2)  provide the retirement system with any information
 needed to complete the report required by Subsection (f).
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.