3 | 5 | | |
---|
4 | 6 | | |
---|
5 | 7 | | |
---|
6 | 8 | | |
---|
7 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 11 | | relating to a study by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas on the |
---|
10 | 12 | | feasibility of offering alternative service retirement benefits to |
---|
11 | 13 | | certain members of the retirement system engaged in wildland |
---|
12 | 14 | | firefighting or employed in positions related to wildland |
---|
13 | 15 | | firefighting. |
---|
14 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 825, Government Code, is |
---|
16 | 18 | | amended by adding Section 825.1086 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 19 | | Sec. 825.1086. STUDY AND REPORT ON ALTERNATIVE SERVICE |
---|
18 | 20 | | RETIREMENT BENEFITS FOR CERTAIN WILDLAND FIREFIGHTERS AND RELATED |
---|
19 | 21 | | EMPLOYEES. (a) The retirement system shall conduct a study on the |
---|
20 | 22 | | feasibility of offering members who are Texas A&M Forest Service |
---|
21 | 23 | | wildland firefighters and are employed in positions related to |
---|
22 | 24 | | wildland firefighting alternative service retirement benefits |
---|
23 | 25 | | under the system. |
---|
24 | 26 | | (b) In conducting the study, the retirement system shall |
---|
25 | 27 | | assess the costs to and impact on the retirement system associated |
---|
26 | 28 | | with offering members described by Subsection (a) the following |
---|
27 | 29 | | alternative service retirement benefits: |
---|
28 | 30 | | (1) a service retirement benefit under the existing |
---|
29 | 31 | | benefit plan that provides retirement eligibility and a |
---|
30 | 32 | | supplemental benefit under Subsection (c) within a new tier, to be |
---|
31 | 33 | | named Hazardous Duty, for: |
---|
32 | 34 | | (A) a member who is at least 55 years old and who |
---|
33 | 35 | | has at least 10 years of service credit as a wildland firefighter; |
---|
34 | 36 | | (B) a member who has at least 25 years of service |
---|
35 | 37 | | credit as a wildland firefighter, regardless of age; or |
---|
36 | 38 | | (C) a member who has at least 20 years of service |
---|
37 | 39 | | credit as a wildland firefighter, except that the member's service |
---|
38 | 40 | | retirement annuity will be actuarially reduced by five percent for |
---|
39 | 41 | | every year of difference between the member's age at retirement and |
---|
40 | 42 | | the normal retirement age within this tier; and |
---|
41 | 43 | | (2) a service retirement benefit under the existing |
---|
42 | 44 | | plan that provides retirement eligibility and a supplemental |
---|
43 | 45 | | benefit under Subsection (c), as applicable, within a new tier, to |
---|
44 | 46 | | be named Hazardous Duty-Administrative Support, for: |
---|
45 | 47 | | (A) a member who is vested in the retirement |
---|
46 | 48 | | system and who has been employed as a wildland firefighter during |
---|
47 | 49 | | the entirety of the member's employment with the Texas A&M Forest |
---|
48 | 50 | | Service; or |
---|
49 | 51 | | (B) a member who has service credit as a wildland |
---|
50 | 52 | | firefighter equal to at least the minimum number of years of service |
---|
51 | 53 | | credit required to vest in the system and who is employed in a |
---|
52 | 54 | | position that provides support services to wildland firefighters on |
---|
53 | 55 | | the member's retirement date. |
---|
54 | 56 | | (c) The standard service retirement annuity for a member who |
---|
55 | 57 | | is eligible to retire under a proposal described by Subsection |
---|
56 | 58 | | (b)(1) or (b)(2)(A) would be an amount computed on the basis of the |
---|
57 | 59 | | member's average annual compensation for the five years of service, |
---|
58 | 60 | | whether or not consecutive, in which the member received the |
---|
59 | 61 | | highest annual compensation, times the sum of the percentage factor |
---|
60 | 62 | | used in the computation of a standard service retirement annuity |
---|
61 | 63 | | under Section 824.203(a) plus 0.5 percent. |
---|
62 | 64 | | (d) The standard service retirement annuity for a member who |
---|
63 | 65 | | is eligible to retire under a proposal described by Subsection |
---|
64 | 66 | | (b)(2)(B) based on the age and service requirements described in |
---|
65 | 67 | | Subsection (b)(1) is the standard service retirement annuity |
---|
66 | 68 | | described by Subsection (c), provided the member is not entitled to |
---|
67 | 69 | | the additional 0.5 percent described by Subsection (c). |
---|
68 | 70 | | (e) Not later than March 1, 2026, the retirement system |
---|
69 | 71 | | shall begin coordinating with the Texas A&M Forest Service to |
---|
70 | 72 | | determine: |
---|
71 | 73 | | (1) positions that will qualify for benefits proposed |
---|
72 | 74 | | by Subsection (b) and the salaries of both existing and terminated |
---|
73 | 75 | | employees who accrued service credit for service provided on or |
---|
74 | 76 | | after September 1, 2009, and who would be eligible to retire under |
---|
75 | 77 | | any of the requirements proposed by Subsection (b) based on that |
---|
76 | 78 | | service credit; |
---|
77 | 79 | | (2) the effectiveness of using either the standard |
---|
78 | 80 | | service retirement annuity calculation under Section 824.203 plus |
---|
79 | 81 | | 0.5 percent or a different annuity calculation that would provide |
---|
80 | 82 | | similar or more benefits than the calculation under Section 824.203 |
---|
81 | 83 | | for a member who would be eligible to retire under any of the |
---|
82 | 84 | | requirements proposed by Subsection (b)(1) while maintaining the |
---|
83 | 85 | | actuarial soundness of the retirement system; |
---|
84 | 86 | | (3) the additional percentage of salary contribution |
---|
85 | 87 | | needed by both the employer and employee to provide for the |
---|
86 | 88 | | alternative retirement benefits proposed by Subsection (b) while |
---|
87 | 89 | | maintaining the actuarial soundness of the retirement system; |
---|
88 | 90 | | (4) the cost computed as additional employer and |
---|
89 | 91 | | employee contributions to provide the alternative retirement |
---|
90 | 92 | | benefits proposed by Subsection (b) attributable to service credit |
---|
91 | 93 | | described by that subsection for service performed on or after |
---|
92 | 94 | | September 1, 2009; and |
---|
93 | 95 | | (5) the cost and implications of the minimum age or |
---|
94 | 96 | | service credit requirements proposed by Subsection (b) to the |
---|
95 | 97 | | extent those age or service credit requirements are less stringent |
---|
96 | 98 | | than the minimum age or service credit requirements provided by |
---|
97 | 99 | | this subtitle. |
---|
98 | 100 | | (f) Not later than December 31, 2026, the retirement system |
---|
99 | 101 | | shall prepare and submit a report to the legislature that contains |
---|
100 | 102 | | the findings of the study and the determinations required by |
---|
101 | 103 | | Subsection (e). |
---|
102 | 104 | | (g) The Legislative Budget Board and the State Pension |
---|
103 | 105 | | Review Board shall, as necessary: |
---|
104 | 106 | | (1) assist the retirement system in conducting the |
---|
105 | 107 | | study; and |
---|
106 | 108 | | (2) provide the retirement system with any information |
---|
107 | 109 | | needed to complete the report required by Subsection (f). |
---|
108 | 110 | | (h) This section expires September 1, 2027. |
---|
109 | 111 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
110 | 112 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
111 | 113 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
112 | 114 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
113 | 115 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|